EP2094614 - INVERT MECHANISM FOR A GLASSWARE FORMING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHR, Paul B. 7520 Noward Road Waterville, OH 43566 / US | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Mergel, Volker Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Mergel, Volker Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07853120.9 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007US23856 | Priority number, date | US20060639931 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 639931 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008073204 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094614 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094614 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/16 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
C03B9/165 (EP,US);
C03B9/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Extension states | AL | 17.06.2009 | BA | 17.06.2009 | HR | 17.06.2009 | MK | 17.06.2009 | RS | 17.06.2009 | Title | German: | UMKEHRMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE GLASWARENFORMGEBUNGSMASCHINE | [2009/36] | English: | INVERT MECHANISM FOR A GLASSWARE FORMING MACHINE | [2009/36] | French: | MÉCANISME D'INVERSION POUR MACHINE DE FORMATION DE VERRERIE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.03.2011 | MT | 09.03.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | LU | 13.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/14] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 09.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3617233 (MUMFORD EUSTACE H) [DA] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4637827 (NEBELUNG HERMANN H [CH], et al) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [A]EP1252110 (HEYE HERMANN FA [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * |