EP2155285 - SIZE-SELECTIVE HEMOPERFUSION POLYMERIC ADSORBENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytosorbents, Inc. 7 Deer Park Dr. Suite K Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | [2021/25] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Cytosorbents, Inc. 7 Deer Park Dr. Suite K Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Medasorb Technologies Corporation 7 Deer Park Drive, Suite K Monmouth Junction NJ 08852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Wei-Tai 5 Deer Haven Drive Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
ALBRIGHT, Robert L. 36 Autumn Road Southampton, PA 18966-1011 / US | 03 /
GOLOBISH, Thomas D. 16 Evergreen Circle Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07853148.0 | 20.11.2007 | [2010/08] | WO2007US24361 | Priority number, date | US20060601931 | 20.11.2006 Original published format: US 601931 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063666 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2155285 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155285 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14, A61M1/36, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, B01J20/26, B01D15/34 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP);
B01J20/3217 (EP);
B01J20/3272 (EP);
B01J20/3293 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | A61M1/14, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, B01J20/26 | ||
Former IPC [2010/08] | A61M1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRÖSSEN-SELEKTIVE HÄMOPERFUSIONS-POLYMER-ADSORBENTIEN | [2010/08] | English: | SIZE-SELECTIVE HEMOPERFUSION POLYMERIC ADSORBENTS | [2010/08] | French: | POLYMÈRES ADSORBANTS D'HÉMOPERFUSION À SÉLECTION DE TAILLE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 26.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 01.08.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.01.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21174061.8 / EP3906996 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2012 | Decision despatched | 16.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 16.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 16.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 16.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 16.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2007 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | TR | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.11.2007 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
TR | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.11.2007 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001008958 (STROM ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XA] - DAVANKOV V ET AL, "Polymeric adsorbent for removing toxic proteins from blood of patients with kidney failure", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20000201), vol. 739, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 73 - 80, XP004190288 [X] 1-9,11-18 * abstract * * Section: "3. Properties of current adsorbing materials for beta2-microgloubin"; page 75 - page 77; figure 1 * * page 78, column left, line 13 - line 18; figure 2 * [A] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X | [X] - ALBRIGHT ET AL, "Porous polymers as an anchor for catalysis", REACTIVE POLYMERS, ION EXCHANGERS, SORBENTS, ELSEVIER, vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3, ISSN 0167-6989, (19860401), pages 155 - 174, (19860401), XP022887581 [X] 1-9,11,15-18 * page 158, column right; figure 3 * * pages 162,163; figures 6,8,9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3 | [X] - BADYAL J P ET AL, "Comparison of the effect of pore architecture and bead size on the extent of plasmachemical amine functionalisation of poly(styrene-co-divinylbenzene) permanently porous resins", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (20040301), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMER.2004.01.072, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 2185 - 2192, XP004493335 [X] 1-11,15-18 * Section: "Suspension polymerisation"; page 2186 - page 2187 * * page 2188; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2004.01.072 | International search | [Y]US5460947 (YOUNG STEVEN [US], et al); | [X]US2003027879 (DAVANKOV VADIM [RU], et al); | [X]US2005281809 (ROBERTS CRAIG P [US], et al) | Examination | WO9830327 | - LOWELL S ET AL, Chapter 8: Mesopore Analysis, CHARACTERIZATION OF POROUS SOLIDS AND POWDERS: SURFACE AREA, PORE SIZE AND DENSITY, SPRINGER SCIENCE, PAGE(S) 101 - 128, (20010718), ISBN 978-90-481-6633-6, XP009517142 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4020-2303-3_8 | - LOTHE R R ET AL, "Purification of alpha-glucosidae and invertase from bakers' yeast on modified polymeric supports", BIOSEPARATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (19990101), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1023/A:1008126628635, ISSN 0923-179X, pages 293 - 306, XP009097677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008126628635 | by applicant | US2001008958 | - "Polymeric adsorbent for removing toxic proteins from blood of patients with kidney failure", DAVANKOV V et al., Journal of Chromatography B: Biomedical Applications, Elsevier Science Publishers, (20000201), vol. 739, pages 73 - 80 | - "Porous polymers as an anchor for catalysis", ALBRIGHT et al., Reactive Polymers, Ion Exchangers, Sorbents, Elsevier, (04018620), vol. 4, pages 155 - 174 |