Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2125778
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.12.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
03.09.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.01.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.09.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2010 |
First examination report |
|
26.02.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
06.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
30.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
15.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|