Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7795249 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2010 | B2 | US2008171754 | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US288307 | 19.12.2007 | US87668806 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010513519 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US26034 | 19.12.2007 | US87668806 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2125778 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US26034 | 19.12.2007 | US87668806 | 22.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008079277 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87668806 | 22.12.2006 |