EP2125778 - CERTAIN PYRAZOLINE DERIVATIVES WITH KINASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Ruth S. 57 Savin Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | 02 /
DUFFEY, Matthew 38-B Raymond Avenue Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
GOULD, Alexandra E. 23R Fairmont Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
GREENSPAN, Paul D. 8 Overlook Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
KULKARNI, Bheemashankar A. 132 North Street, 4 Newton, MA 02460 / US | 06 /
VOS, Tricia J. 203 Woburn Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07853440.1 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007US26034 | Priority number, date | US20060876688P | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 876688 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008079277 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125778 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D409/14, C07D413/14, A61P35/00, A61K31/4155 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | BESTIMMTE PYRAZOLINDERIVATE MIT KINASEHEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2009/49] | English: | CERTAIN PYRAZOLINE DERIVATIVES WITH KINASE INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [2009/49] | French: | CERTAINS DÉRIVÉS DE PYRAZOLINE AVEC UNE ACTIVITÉ INHIBITRICE DE KINASE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03079973 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 12, Formula II; page 16 *; | [A]WO2006007496 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * claim 1 * | by applicant | - CHILOECHES; MARAIS, Targets for Cancer Therapy; Transcription Factors and Other Nuclear Proteins, HUMANA PRESS, (2002), pages 179 - 206 | - MARAIS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 4378 - 4383 | - PEYSSONNAUX; EYCHENE, BIOL. CELL, (2001), vol. 93, pages 53 - 62 | - WELLBROCK ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 2338 - 2342 |