EP2074543 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUPING TRAFFIC EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garmin Switzerland GmbH Vorstadt 40/42 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2010/43] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Garmin Ltd. PO Box 30464 SMB 5th Floor, Harbour Place 103 South Church Street George Town / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZUM, Timothy C. 16140 W. 156th Place Olathe, KS 66062 / US | 02 /
BRUNK, Scott J. 36495 W. 239th Street Edgerton, KS 66021 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP Am Sandtorkai 50 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07853800.6 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US80602 | Priority number, date | US20060549016 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: US 549016 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008045798 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2074543 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074543 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G08G1/0967 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G08G1/096716 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GRUPPIERUNG VON VERKEHRSEREIGNISSEN | [2009/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GROUPING TRAFFIC EVENTS | [2009/27] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE REGROUPEMENT D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DE TRAFIC | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 30.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2007 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 05.10.2016 | LU | 05.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004204845 (WONG WINNIE [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * figures 1a,1b,48,9,15,16 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099] * [Y] 9; | [XY]US2005033504 (RENNELS ERNEST B [US]) [X] 12-15 * figures 5,7 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * [Y] 9; | [X]EP1338867 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9,12-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6990407 (MBEKEANI LUMUMBA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-15 * column 2, line 4 - line 7 * * column 3, line 18 - line 29 * * column 4, line 34 - line 48 * * column 6, line 17 - line 37 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 1 * * column 13, line 26 - line 27 * * column 19, line 56 - column 20, line 43 * * column 23, line 5 - line 40 * * column 24, line 51 - column 28, line 7 * * column 30, line 7 - line 46 * * figures 2-4 * | International search | [Y]US2006058940 (KUMAGAI MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005033504 (RENNELS ERNEST B [US]); | [Y]US2004143385 (SMYTH BRIAN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2003112156 (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US6161092 (LATSHAW GARY L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004204845 | US6434485 |