EP2080102 - NETWORK INTERFACE TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOONG, Annie 7560 SW Becky Court Aloha, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
VEAL, Bryan 1381 NE Carlaby Way, Apt 113 Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07853826.1 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US80633 | Priority number, date | US20060539510 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: US 539510 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008045809 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080102 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F9/455, H04L29/08 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
G06F9/45537 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US);
H04L69/321 (EP,US);
H04L69/325 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | G06F13/38, H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/30] | G06F13/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLEN-TECHNIKEN | [2009/30] | English: | NETWORK INTERFACE TECHNIQUES | [2009/30] | French: | TECHNIQUES RELATIVES À UNE INTERFACE RÉSEAU | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006126628 (LI YUNHONG [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] ** paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * | International search | [A]US6070188 (GRANT COLIN [GB], et al); | [A]US6148361 (CARPENTER GARY DALE [US], et al); | [A]US6467007 (ARMSTRONG TROY DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006126628 |