EP2069521 - BIOMARKERS OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA, Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKLY, Linda C. 34 Winthrop Street West Newton Massachusetts 02465 / US | 02 /
HAHM, Kyungmin 49 Eldred Street Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
BURKLY, Linda C. 34 Winthrop Street West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | ||
02 /
HAHM, Kyungmin 2360 Commonwealth Avenue 2-3 Aburndale, Massachusetts 02466 / US | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854043.2 | 15.10.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US81374 | Priority number, date | US20060851957P | 16.10.2006 Original published format: US 851957 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008048924 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069521 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/564 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/948 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70575 (EP,US);
G01N2800/285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | C12Q1/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2009 | BA | 31.03.2009 | HR | 31.03.2009 | MK | 31.03.2009 | RS | 31.03.2009 | Title | German: | BIOMARKER FÜR MULTIPLE SKLEROSE | [2009/25] | English: | BIOMARKERS OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2009/25] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS DE SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUE | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/25] | BIOMARQUEURS DE SCLEROSE EN PLAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 29.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - AGNELLO, D., ET AL, "Increased peripheral benzodiazepine binding sites and pentraxin 3 expression in the spinal cord during EAE: relation to inflammatory cytokines and modulation by dexamethasone and rolipram", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 109, pages 105 - 111, XP002553063 [X] 4,6-10,15-17 * page 105 - page 108 * [A] 1-3,5,11-14,18-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(00)00279-4 | [XA] - IBRAHIM S M ET AL, "GENE EXPRESSION PROFILING OF THE NERVOUS SYSTEM IN MURINE EXPERIMENTAL AUTOIMMUNE ENCEPHALOMYELITIS", BRAIN, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20010101), vol. 124, no. 10, ISSN 0006-8950, pages 1927 - 1938, XP008020655 [X] 20,22 *abstract, page 1928, table 1* [A] 1-19,21,23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/brain/124.10.1927 | [A] - YOSSI GILGUN-SHERKI ET AL, "Analysis of Gene Expression in MOG-Induced Experimental Autoimmune Encephalomyelitis After Treatment With a Novel Brain-Penetrating Antioxidant", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, BIRKHAEUSER, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, (20050101), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0895-8696, pages 125 - 136, XP007906193 [A] 1-23 *abstract, page126, right-hand column, line 6 - page 128, right-hand column, line 22, figure 3* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/JMN:27:01:125 | [A] - DESPLAT-JEGO S ET AL, "TWEAK is expressed by glial cells, induces astrocyte proliferation and increases EAE severity", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX, (20021201), vol. 133, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 116 - 123, XP002323491 [A] 1-23 *abstract, page 120, left-hand column, line 16 - page 121, left-hand column, line 2* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(02)00368-5 | [A] - DESPLAT-JEGO ET AL, "Anti-TWEAK monoclonal antibodies reduce immune cell infiltration in the central nervous system and severity of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20051001), vol. 117, no. 1, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 15 - 23, XP005046712 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clim.2005.06.005 | [A] - DEBRUYNE, J. C., ET AL, "PET visualization of microglia in multiple sclerosis patients using [11C]PK11195", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY, (2003), vol. 10, pages 257 - 264, XP002553064 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1468-1331.2003.00571.x | International search | [X]US2006211090 (BEJANIN STEPHANE [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2006089095 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) |