EP2086797 - AIRBAG COVER TEAR SEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv ASP, Inc. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states AUTOLIV ASP, INC. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLA, Terry 10420 East Washington Reese, Michigan 48757 / US | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Beth 2231 Raven Road Unit 111 Raleigh NC 27614 / US | 03 /
KUTCHEY, Mike 199 Presidio Ortonville, Michigan 48462 / US | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/33] | 01 /
SELLA, Terry 10420 East Washington Reese, Michigan 48757 / US | ||
02 /
HOFFMANN, Beth 2231 Raven Road Unit 111 Raleigh NC 27614 / US | |||
03 /
KUTCHEY, Mike 19150 Plantation Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854171.1 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US81789 | Priority number, date | US20060593769 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: US 593769 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008057736 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086797 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086797 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
B60R21/201 (EP,US);
B60R21/205 (EP,US);
B60R21/2165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | RISSNAHT FÜR EINEN AIRBAG | [2009/33] | English: | AIRBAG COVER TEAR SEAM | [2009/33] | French: | COUTURE DE DÉCHIRURE DE RECOUVREMENT DE COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 20.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | BE | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | MT | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | GB | 18.10.2011 | IE | 18.10.2011 | LU | 18.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
GB | 18.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
GB | 18.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
GB | 18.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
GB | 18.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
GB | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5096220 (NAKAJIMA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US5221108 (HIRABAYASHI HIROKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US6070904 (OZAKI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]DE10128745 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US6682093 (TAJIMA KOH [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US2006192368 (HALL MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]US2006192373 (MANLEY SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-14 * column W * | International search | [X]US6099026 (ANDO MASAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003019535 (BROWN JEFFREY STEVEN [GB], et al) | by applicant | US6099026 | US2006192368 |