EP2084822 - METHOD OF DEPLOYING AN ACCESS POINT FOR AN IP-BASED WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINKOLA, Janne P. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | 02 /
SENOUR, Jelena 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | 03 /
GRIMES, Amy 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07854249.5 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US82010 | Priority number, date | US20060552089 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: US 552089 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008051874 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2084822 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/04, H04W88/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
H04W88/005 (EP,US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN EINSATZ EINES ZUGANGSPUNKTES FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES NETZWERK AUF IP-BASIS | [2009/32] | English: | METHOD OF DEPLOYING AN ACCESS POINT FOR AN IP-BASED WIRELESS NETWORK | [2009/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLOIEMENT D'UN POINT D'ACCÈS POUR UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL IP | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006018047 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,3,4,7,10 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, lines 21-28 * * page 14, line 1 - page 17, line 2 * * page 18, line 33 - page 19, line 20 *; | [XI]WO2006078430 (CISCO TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, lines 20-30 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 20 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 9 * [I] 9-15; | [XI]EP1530321 (BUFFALO INC [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0030] * * paragraphs [0039] , [0042] , [0046] * [I] 9-15 | International search | [Y]US2005159149 (WEN KUEI-ANN [TW], et al); | [Y]US2004078708 (LI CHUANG [US], et al); | [A]US2005243809 (BEST JAMES F [US], et al) |