EP2087742 - THREE DIMENSIONAL PROJECTION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Poszat HU, L.L.C. 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states F. Poszat HU, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMERON, Collin David Qinetiq Limited Malvern Technology Centre St. Andrew's Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | 02 /
WILSON, Christopher Paul Alport House Alport Road Witchurch, Shropshire SY13 1NR / GB | 03 /
DE BRAAL, Anton Qinetiq Limited Malvern Technology Centre St. Andrew's Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/33] | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07854846.8 | 29.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US85964 | Priority number, date | US20060861430P | 29.11.2006 Original published format: US 861430 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008067482 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2087742 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H04N13/363 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N5/74 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE PROJEKTIONSANZEIGE | [2009/33] | English: | THREE DIMENSIONAL PROJECTION DISPLAY | [2009/33] | French: | AFFICHAGE PAR PROJECTION À TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 13.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4714428 (BUNKER WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9,11,16-18 * column 3, lines 7-34 * * column 5, lines 3-7 * * column 6, lines 39-43 * * column 18, lines 35-54 *; | [A]US2003034974 (WELCH GREGORY F [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9-11,16-18* paragraphs [0040] , [0065] , [076Ö] *; | [A]US6729733 (RASKAR RAMESH [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9-11,16-18 * column 5, lines 62-67 * * column 6, lines 14-19 *; | [X]WO2005112474 (SETRED AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,16-18 * page 9, lines 5-13 * * page 19, line 3 - page 20, line 16 * * page 28, lines 13,14 * * page 34, lines 3-21 * * page 41, lines 8-18 *; | [A]US2006256302 (HSU FENG-HSIUNG [US]) [A] 1-3,9-11,16-18 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] * * figure 3 * | Examination | - RAMESH RASKAR ET AL, "Efficient Image Generation for Multiprojector and Multisurface Displays", Rendering Techniques '98, VIENNA, SPRINGER VIENNA, (19980101), pages 139 - 144, doi:10.1007/978-3-7091-6453-2_13, ISSN 0946-2767, ISBN 978-3-70-916453-2, XP055066637 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-7091-6453-2_13 |