EP2097667 - EXCHANGE UNIT HAVING A SMALL VOLUME LUBRICANT DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Günther Im Salmenkopf 7 77866 Rheinau / DE | For all designated states Zimmer, Martin Mühlenstrasse 6 77866 Rheinau / DE | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Thämer, Wolfgang Zürn & Thämer Patentanwälte Adalbert-Stifter-Straße 12 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Thämer, Wolfgang Zürn & Thämer Patentanwälte Hermann-Köhl-Weg 8 76571 Gaggenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856020.8 | 26.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007DE02126 | Priority number, date | DE20061056257 | 27.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056257 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008064651 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097667 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097667 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/32, F16N7/30, F16N19/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
F16N7/34 (EP);
F16N2270/72 (EP);
F16N2270/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | EINWECHSELAGGREGAT MIT KLEINMENGENSCHMIERMITTELSPENDER | [2009/37] | English: | EXCHANGE UNIT HAVING A SMALL VOLUME LUBRICANT DISPENSER | [2009/37] | French: | ORGANE INTERCHANGEABLE AVEC DISTRIBUTEUR DE PETITES QUANTITÉS DE LUBRIFIANT | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IE | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | MT | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | LU | 26.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 26.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 26.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 26.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
MT | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2995213 (GROSS BERNARD S) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 25 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4895222 (HOFFMANN RALPH M [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 53 ** figure 2 *; | [A]US5197569 (ROESSLER DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, lines 20-38 * * figure 2 * |