Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009143822 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008025257 | 27.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2297390 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2012 | B1 | EP2297390 | 23.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008025257 | 27.05.2008 | WO2009DE00725 | 27.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2097667 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2011 | B1 | EP2097667 | 09.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 | WO2007DE02126 | 26.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE503959T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 | WO2007DE02126 | 26.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE555244T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008025257 | 27.05.2008 | WO2009DE00725 | 27.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008025257 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008025257 | 27.05.2008 | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502007006857D1 | 12.05.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 | WO2007DE02126 | 26.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008064651 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006056257 | 29.05.2013 | B4 | DE102006056257 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006056257 | 27.11.2006 |