EP2100474 - SENSOR TRANSPONDER UNIT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Post AG Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 20 53113 Bonn / DE | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULRICH, Keith Kinkelstrasse 14 53227 Bonn-Oberkassel / DE | 02 /
WILMS, Stefan Viktoriastrasse 132 46397 Bocholt / DE | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
ULRICH, Keith Kinkelstrasse 14 53227 Bonn-Oberkassel / DE | ||
02 /
WILMS, Stefan Piusstr. 45 50823 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856356.6 | 04.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007EP10515 | Priority number, date | DE20061057645 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006057645 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008067985 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100474 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | SENSOR-TRANSPONDER-EINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHREM BETREIBEN | [2009/38] | English: | SENSOR TRANSPONDER UNIT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IT | [2009/38] | French: | UNITÉ CAPTEUR-TRANSPONDEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 01.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004246104 (BAECHTIGER ROLF [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14,17,21 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0062] *; | [X]US2006186997 (OSTERTAG THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-17 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] *; | [X]US5719550 (BLOCH WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1-14,17-21 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 14 * |