EP2101929 - A PAINT ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEACOP, Alexander 6 Bunnies Lane Rowde Devizes SN10 2QB / GB | 02 /
ELSTOW, Corinne Elizabeth 12 Salisbury Road Marlborough Wiltshire SN8 4AB / GB | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2009/39] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Legal & IP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 07856503.3 | 10.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP10727 | Priority number, date | GB20060025872 | 23.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0625872 | GB20070009946 | 24.05.2007 Original published format: GB 0709946 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008077471 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101929 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/02, B44D3/12 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B05C17/0205 (EP);
B44D3/12 (GB);
B05C17/0245 (EP);
B44D3/125 (EP);
B44D3/126 (EP,GB);
B05C17/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | FARBROLLER | [2009/39] | English: | A PAINT ROLLER | [2009/39] | French: | ROULEAU A PEINDRE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4765766 (HEITMANN KENNETH [US], et al); | [XY]WO2004065227 (VALSPAR SOURING INC [US], et al); | [X]DE10322768 (FIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2005120864 (ICI PLC [GB], et al); | [XYIA]DE202005018488U (TECHNO WERKZEUGE A E VERTRIEBS [DE]) | by applicant | WO03024725 | WO2005120864 |