EP2102896 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING ARTICLES, ESPECIALLY THIN WAFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENA GmbH Ob der Eck 5 78148 Gütenbach / DE | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Rena Sondermaschinen GmbH Ob der Eck 5 78148 Gütenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜRGER, Norbert Alemannenhof 5 79199 Kirchzarten / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Stürken, Joachim, et al Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Kirchenhölzle 18 79104 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Stürken, Joachim, et al Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsges. mbH Kirchenhölzle 18 79104 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856509.0 | 10.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP10734 | Priority number, date | DE20061059810 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059810 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071364 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102896 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102896 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/67051 (EP,US);
H01L21/302 (KR);
B08B11/02 (EP,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,US);
B08B3/10 (EP,US);
H01L21/67023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN, INSBESONDERE VON DÜNNEN SCHEIBEN | [2009/39] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING ARTICLES, ESPECIALLY THIN WAFERS | [2009/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR NETTOYER DES OBJETS, EN PARTICULIER DES PLAQUETTES MINCES | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IE | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | LU | 10.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
LU | 10.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5069235 (VETTER WILLIAM L [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-17 * abstract * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 37; figure 3 *; | [XY]US6139591 (NAKAURA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,12-17 * abstract * * column 10, line 9 - line 52 * [Y] 11; | [X]DE10020523 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-17 * abstract * * column 8, line 49 - column 10 *; | [Y]US6423146 (FUKAZAWA YUJI [JP]) [Y] 11 * abstract ** column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 20 * | by applicant | US5069235 | US6139591 | DE10020523 | US6423146 |