EP2089084 - ATTACHMENT FOR A SYRINGE OR A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arzneimittel GmbH Apotheker Vetter & Co. Ravensburg Marienplatz 79 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLOCKER, Joachim Pflugstrasse 13 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/34] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856592.6 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP10844 | Priority number, date | DE20061058719 | 13.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006058719 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071403 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089084 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089084 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/28, A61M5/31, A61M39/28 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/28 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3103 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3128 (EP,US);
A61M39/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFSATZ FÜR EINE SPRITZE ODER EINE KARPULE | [2009/34] | English: | ATTACHMENT FOR A SYRINGE OR A CARTRIDGE | [2009/34] | French: | GARNITURE POUR SERINGUE OU AMPOULE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2007 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MT | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 12.12.2007 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.12.2007 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.12.2007 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005039669 (MDC INVEST HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0068] - [0075]; figures 12-15 *; | [X]US5489274 (CHU MICHAEL S H [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4243034 (BRANDT WERNER J) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2415496 (FLESCH UDO DIPL PHYS) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005215952 (BRUNEL MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |