21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
30.12.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
22.01.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
18.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
17.07.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
15.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|