Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8152772 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2010030160 | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP10844 | 12.12.2007 | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5313160B | Global Dossier | 09.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010512206 | 22.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP10844 | 12.12.2007 | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2089084 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B1 | EP2089084 | 19.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP10844 | 12.12.2007 | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2671395 | 02.12.2014 | C | CA2671395 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP10844 | 12.12.2007 | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2568682T | 03.05.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP10844 | 12.12.2007 | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008071403 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006058719 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006058719 | 13.12.2006 |