EP2121318 - FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIKNES, Hans Georg Tryms vei 8 3960 Stathelle / NO | 02 /
MYHRE, Ole Jan Saturnveien 48 3941 Porsgrunn / NO | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07856918.3 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007EP11195 | Priority number, date | EP20060256528 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06256528 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074493 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121318 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121318 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | FOLIE | [2009/48] | English: | FILM | [2009/48] | French: | PELLICULE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 10.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2011
10.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE The Dow Chemical Company 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US Opponent's representative Marsman, Hermanus Antonius M. V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2011
10.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE The Dow Chemical Company 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US Opponent's representative Marsman, Hermanus Antonius M. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2011/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2011
The Dow Chemical Company 2030 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US Opponent's representative de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria Dow Benelux B.V. Patent Department Herbert H. Dowweg 5 4542 NM Hoek / NL | 07.04.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.10.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/01] | 13.08.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2010 | BE | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | MT | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | PT | 04.10.2010 | HU | 03.12.2010 | IE | 19.12.2010 | LU | 19.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
HU | 03.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
LU | 19.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 02.06.2010 | |
BE | 02.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
PT | 04.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0202323 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 2; examples 11,3,5; claims 1,7,10,12,17 * * page 5, line 13 - line 23 * * page 13, line 14 - line 25 *; | [A]WO2004000902 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,15,19-21* page 10, line 25 - line 27; example 6; claims 7,9,10 *; | [A]WO2006037603 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 19; claims 1,2,4-8,11,12,16,18,20-22 * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 11 - line 25 * | by applicant | - K. K. MCAULEY; J. F. MCGREGOR, "On-line Inference of Polymer Properties in an Industrial Polyethylene Reactor", AICHE JOURNAL, (199106), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 825 - 835 |