EP2125391 - TIRE WITH IMPROVED ENDURANCE TO EXTERNAL IMPACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERINO, LOPEZ, José 119, Rue St Don F-63200 Riom / FR | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Randl, Oliver Georg M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, Place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Randl, Oliver Georg MFP Michelin Place des Carmes - Déchaux SGD/PI F35/LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Randl, Oliver Georg MFP Michelin Place des Carmes - Déchaux SGD/PI F35/LAD F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07857049.6 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007EP11334 | Priority number, date | FR20060011552 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0611552 | [2009/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080583 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125391 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125391 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/06 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B60C19/00 (EP,US);
B60C13/00 (EP,US);
B60C17/103 (EP,US);
B60C5/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT VERBESSERTER BESTÄNDIGKEIT GEGEN STÖSSE VON AUSSEN | [2009/49] | English: | TIRE WITH IMPROVED ENDURANCE TO EXTERNAL IMPACTS | [2009/49] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE A ENDURANCE AMELIOREE VIS-A-VIS DES CHOCS EXTERNES | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | IE | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | NL | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
IS | 15.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2317111 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* page 4, lines 20-31; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0668174 (VREDESTEIN FIETSBANDEN B V [NL]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5591283 (MAHLING ROLF [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 2, lines 40-53 * * column 6, lines 15-23; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO0218157 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [X] 3-5 * the whole document * |