EP2104675 - SUBSTITUTED 5H-PYRIMIDOL[5,4-B]INDOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING NON-SOLID MALIGNANT TUMORS OF THE BLOOD-PRODUCING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Medicines Company (Leipzig) GmbH Deutscher Platz 5d 04103 Leipzig / DE | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHELT, Claudia Schönbachstrasse 54 04299 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
SCHULZE, Alexander Anbau 3 04886 Grosstreben Zwethau OT Dautzschen / DE | 03 /
DAGHISH, Mohammed Mozartstrasse 6 04107 Leipzig / DE | 04 /
LUDWIG, Alexander Arndtstrasse 25c 04275 Leipzig / DE | 05 /
HEINICKE, Jochen Weissenfelser Strasse 11 04229 Leipzig / DE | 06 /
HERRMANN, Konrad Wasserwerksweg 14 04668 Grimma / DE | 07 /
SCHUSTER, Maj Merseburger Strasse 1 04229 Leipzig / DE | 08 /
LETSCHERT, Sven Alfred-Kästner-Strasse 36 04275 Leipzig / DE | 09 /
MUGRIDGE, Kenneth Moschelesstrasse 4 04109 Leipzig / DE | 10 /
DeANGELO, Joseph 315 Sweet Bay Place Carrboro, NC 27510 / US | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07857094.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007EP11387 | Priority number, date | DE20061062203 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006062203 | [2009/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077631 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104675 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104675 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 5H-PYRIMIDOL[5,4-B]INDOLE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NICHT-SOLIDEN MALIGNEN TUMOREN DES BLUTBILDENDEN SYSTEMS | [2009/40] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 5H-PYRIMIDOL[5,4-B]INDOLES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING NON-SOLID MALIGNANT TUMORS OF THE BLOOD-PRODUCING SYSTEM | [2009/40] | French: | 5H-PYRIMIDOL[5,4-B]INDOLES SUBSTITUÉS, PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FABRICATION, ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS MALIGNES NON SOLIDES DU SYSTÈME SANGUIN | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X] - MERINO I ET AL, "Synthesis and anti-HIV-1 activities of new pyrimido[5,4-b]indoles", IL FARMACO, ROME, IT, (1999), vol. 54, ISSN 0014-827X, pages 255 - 264, XP002388500 [X] 1-3,5 * tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-827X(99)00035-X |