EP2114375 - RAPIDLY DISPERSABLE, PARTICULATE FILM COATING AGENT BASED ON POLYVINYL ALCOHOL-POLYETHER GRAFT COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLTER, Karl Sudetenstr. 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
MASCHKE, Angelika Roritzer Strasse 6 93047 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
DIETZEN, Franz-Josef Pommernstrasse 5 a 67454 Hassloch / DE | 04 /
SCHMELLER, Thorsten Im Höhnhausen 39 67157 Wachenheim / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/48] | Application number, filing date | 07857369.8 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007EP63674 | Priority number, date | EP20060127337 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06127337 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080774 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2114375 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114375 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K9/14 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/284 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | A61K9/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | SCHNELLDISPERGIERBARES, TEILCHENFÖRMIGES FILMÜBERZUGSMITTEL BASIEREND AUF POLYVINYLALKOHOL-POLYETHER-PFROPFCOPOLYMEREN | [2009/46] | English: | RAPIDLY DISPERSABLE, PARTICULATE FILM COATING AGENT BASED ON POLYVINYL ALCOHOL-POLYETHER GRAFT COPOLYMERS | [2009/46] | French: | AGENT D'ENROBAGE SOUS FORME DE FILM, FORMÉ DE PARTICULES À DISPERSION RAPIDE, À BASE DE COPOLYMÈRES GREFFÉS DE POLYVINYLALCOOL-POLYÉTHER | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | HU | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | LU | 11.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 11.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0018375 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 17, line 12 - line 20 * * page 18, line 33 - line 38 * * example 7 * * page 19, line 14 - line 26 *; | [Y]EP1136254 (BASF DRUCKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * example 2 * * claims 1-12 *; | [DXY]WO03070224 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-16 * page 8, line 1 - line 25 * * page 12, line 41 - line 47 * * page 13, line 7 - line 17 * * page 16, line 34 - line 41 * * example 9 * [Y] 17,18; | [A]US2005196444 (KOLTER KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-18* example 9 *; | [YD]WO2006002808 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-18 * examples 1,5 * * page 8, line 18 - line 24 *; | [Y]WO2006018130 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example 2 *; | [Y]EP1674485 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * page 11, paragraph 102 - page 12, paragraph 104 * * claims 1-13 * |