EP2104901 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING COMPUTER FRAUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUMANN, John 19 Cleveland Drive Croton-on-Hudson, New York 10520 / US | 02 /
VERMA, Dinesh 56 Kisco Park Drive Mount Kisco, New York 10549 / US | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Mail Point 110 Hursley Park, Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Mail Point 110 Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 07857501.6 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007EP63845 | Priority number, date | US20070623516 | 16.01.2007 Original published format: US 623516 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086924 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104901 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104901 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/20, H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
G06F21/30 (KR);
G06F21/10 (KR);
G06F21/36 (KR);
G06F21/604 (KR);
H04L61/4511 (KR);
H04L63/1483 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON COMPUTERBETRUG | [2009/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING COMPUTER FRAUD | [2009/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE FRAUDE INFORMATIQUE | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2011 | BE | 02.02.2011 | CY | 02.02.2011 | CZ | 02.02.2011 | DK | 02.02.2011 | EE | 02.02.2011 | FI | 02.02.2011 | HU | 02.02.2011 | LT | 02.02.2011 | LV | 02.02.2011 | MT | 02.02.2011 | PL | 02.02.2011 | RO | 02.02.2011 | SI | 02.02.2011 | SK | 02.02.2011 | TR | 02.02.2011 | BG | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | IS | 02.06.2011 | PT | 02.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
TR | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 02.02.2011 | |
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.02.2011 | |
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2004123157 (ALAGNA MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 23-25,34,35 * paragraphs [0040] - [0053] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0101] * [A] 1-22,26-33; | [XA]WO2006018647 (PUGH RHODERICK JOHN KENNEDY [GB]) [X] 23-25,34,35 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 1 * * page 16, line 25 - page 24, line 22 * [A] 1-22,26-33; | [XA]WO2006026921 (METASWARM HONGKONG LTD [CN]) [X] 23-25,34,35 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 2 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 10 * * page 16, lines 16-20 * * page 18, line 12 - page 20, line 1 * * page 24, line 16 - page 32, line 4 * * page 35, lines 4-13 * * page 36, lines 11-28 * * page 38, line 6 - page 41, line 21 * * page 43, line 6 - page 45, line 9 * [A] 1-22,26-33; | [XA]EP1681825 (STREAMSHIELD NETWORKS LTD [GB]) [X] 23-25,34,35 * column 5, line 24 - column 8, line 48 *[A] 1-22,26-33 |