EP2115965 - LOW-POWER WIRELESS MULTI-HOP NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenpeak Technologies Lange Lozanastraat 22 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2011/48] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Ubiwave Lange Lozanastraat 22 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE KIMPE, Wim Heirbaan 9 9240 Zele / BE | 02 /
NOEL, Stephan Clos du Parnasse 3, Bte 25 1050 Ixelles / BE | 03 /
VAN DEN BOSCH, Bram Kroondreef 16 2970 Schilde / BE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Office Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Bird, William Edward Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 07857527.1 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007EP63880 | Priority number, date | EP20060026012 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06026012 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071762 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115965 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2115965 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W68/02 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W68/025 (EP,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE MEHRSPRUNG-NETZE MIT GERINGEM STROMVERBRAUCH | [2009/46] | English: | LOW-POWER WIRELESS MULTI-HOP NETWORKS | [2009/46] | French: | RÉSEAU À PLUSIEURS BONDS SANS FIL À FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2007 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | IE | 13.12.2016 | LU | 13.12.2016 | MT | 13.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 13.12.2007 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 13.12.2007 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 13.12.2007 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.12.2007 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1657852 (SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP1473870 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [A]WO2006069067 (SENSICAST SYSTEMS [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0063] * | [X] - SCHURGERS C ET AL, "TOPOLOGY MANAGEMENT FOR SENSOR NETWORKS: EXPLOITING LATENCY AND DENSITY", MOBIHOC 2002. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD. ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MOBILE AD HOC NETWORKING AND COMPUTING. LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND, JUNE 9, (20020609), ISBN 1-58113-501-7, pages 135 - 145, XP001171557 [X] 1,22-27 * paragraph 3.2-3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/513800.513817 | by applicant | EP1657852 |