EP2129905 - SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL POWER AND POTABLE WATER FROM SEA WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecocean Renewables Limited Suite 110 12 South Bridge Edinburgh EH1 1DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Ecocean Renewables Limited 12 South Bridge Edinburgh, Scotland EH1 1DD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPADOPOULOS, Christos F. 79 Konstantinoupoleos Str. 118 55 Athens / GR | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/50] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07857776.4 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/50] | WO2007EP64152 | Priority number, date | GR20060100687 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: GR 20060100687 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008074810 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2129905 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18, F04B9/129 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
F04B35/004 (EP,US);
F03B13/1875 (GR);
B01D61/08 (GR);
B01D61/10 (GR);
F03B13/1865 (EP,US);
F03B13/24 (GR);
F04B17/00 (EP,US);
F04B9/1376 (EP,US);
F05B2220/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM UND TRINKWASSER AUS MEERESWELLEN | [2009/50] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL POWER AND POTABLE WATER FROM SEA WAVES | [2009/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À GÉNÉRER UNE ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DE L'EAU POTABLE À PARTIR DE VAGUES MARINES | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2005108778 (IRTI MARIA GIULIANA [IT]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,13-18,20,21,23 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, lines 35,36 * * page 4, lines 28-32 * * page 5, line 28 - page 8, line 3 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,7,11,12,19,22; | [Y]US4410304 (BERGLOFF RAYMOND A [US], et al) [Y] 2,7 * column 1, lines 5-53 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 40 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2214298 (ARO CORP) [Y] 2,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5701740 (TVETER TORGER [NO]) [Y] 11,12,19,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 18 * * figures 1-3 * * claim 25 * |