EP2102484 - FUEL FILTER OF A VEHICLE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBALL, Michael Galileistrasse 30/2 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
LIKA, Torsten Augustenstrasse 105 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
PFEFFER, Andreas Traubenstrasse 9 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07857787.1 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP64164 | Priority number, date | DE20061060128 | 20.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006060128 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074812 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102484 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102484 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/22 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B01D35/18 (EP,US);
B01D27/08 (EP);
B01D36/006 (EP);
F02M37/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFFILTER EINES FAHRZEUG-VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2009/39] | English: | FUEL FILTER OF A VEHICLE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2009/39] | French: | FILTRE À CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION DE VÉHICULE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 10.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IE | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | IT | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | MT | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/33] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
MT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
MT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO02095211 (MAHLE FILTERSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-13 * page 7, line 9 - page 12, line 10; figures 6,7 *; | [A]FR2829703 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-13* page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 9; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2005031148 (UFI FILTERS SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 10; figure 1 * |