EP2234825 - DEVICE FOR RECEIVING SIGNALS FROM SENSORS ASSOCIATED WITH VEHICLE'S COMPONENTS, PARTICULARLY TIRES, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.P.A. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUDISIO, Giorgio c/o PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 I-20126 Milano / IT | 02 /
MANCOSU, Federico c/o PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 I-20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
MARIANI, Fabio c/o PIRELLI TYRE S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 I-20126 Milano / IT | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Maccalli, Marco, et al Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini, 40 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Maccalli, Marco, et al Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l., Via Settembrini, 40 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07857870.5 | 19.12.2007 | [2010/40] | WO2007EP64249 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009080097 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234825 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2234825 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/0433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN VON FAHRZEUGKOMPONENTEN, INSBESONDERE REIFEN, ZUGEORDNETEN SENSOREN, UND SYSTEM DAMIT | [2010/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR RECEIVING SIGNALS FROM SENSORS ASSOCIATED WITH VEHICLE'S COMPONENTS, PARTICULARLY TIRES, AND SYSTEM COMPRISING THE SAME | [2010/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RECEVOIR DES SIGNAUX PROVENANT DE CAPTEURS ASSOCIÉS À DES COMPOSANTS DU VÉHICULE, EN PARTICULIER DES PNEUS, ET SYSTÈME LE COMPRENANT | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 01.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | IE | 19.12.2011 | LU | 19.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6087930 (KULKA HARVEY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13 * column 8, line 42 - column 10, line 63 * * table 1 * * figures 3,7,9,10 *[A] 3-8; | [XA]JP2007237781 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,9-13 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 3-8 |