EP2108239 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCHTMAN, Rene Schwarzwaldstrasse 84 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KACZUN, Jürgen In den Backhauswiesen 15 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Norbert Frankenstr. 6 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
PFISTER, Jürgen St.-Klara-Kloster-Weg 62b 67346 Speyer / DE | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07858029.7 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/42] | WO2007EP64413 | Priority number, date | EP20070100159 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07100159 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080893 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108239 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/04, H05K3/24 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H05K3/04 (KR);
H05K3/046 (EP,US);
H05K3/207 (EP,US);
H05K3/24 (KR);
H05K3/246 (EP,US);
H05K1/095 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2009/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SURFACES | [2009/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SURFACES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICES | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005191511 (AOKI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13,16,17,22 * paragraphs [0037] - [0055] - [0103] , [0121]; figures 1-3,11 * [Y] 8,9,14,15,18-21; | [DY]US6177151 (CHRISEY DOUGLAS B [US], et al) [DY] 8,9,14,15,21 * column 4, line 29 - column 10, line 17; figures 1,2a,2b; claim 3 *; | [Y]WO02096168 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INC [FR], et al) [Y] 18,19 * claims 1,11 *; | [Y]GB574946 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [Y] 20 * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0530564 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 18-20 * column 3, lines 31-44; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP0483782 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]DE4330961 (KRONE AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [DA]WO9944402 (MOORE ROYSTON [GB], et al) [DA] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006124320 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [A] 15 * page 4, line 32 * | Examination | WO2007144322 | US2009285976 | DE10051850 |