EP2092135 - INSULATED PANEL AND INTERLOCK MECHANISM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rautaruukki OYJ Suolakivenkatu 1 00810 Helsinki / FI | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URBANOWSKI, Tadeusz Kosmonautow 13/38 61-631 Poznan / PL | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Westerholm, Carl Christian Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Westerholm, Carl Christian BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/35] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster OY AB P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07858364.8 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007FI50713 | Priority number, date | FI20060005833 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: FI 20065833 | FI20070005145 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: FI 20075145 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074926 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092135 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/292, E04B1/61, E04B1/68, E04F13/08 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
E04C2/292 (EP);
E04F13/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE PLATTE UND SPERRMECHANISMUS DAFÜR | [2009/35] | English: | INSULATED PANEL AND INTERLOCK MECHANISM THEREOF | [2009/35] | French: | PANNEAU ISOLANT ET MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 11.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0177457 (TRIMO D D [SI]; NOVAK ANDREJ [SI]; STIH SILVO [SI]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, lines 21-24; figures 1,2,4 * * page 5, paragraph last *; | [X]US5247770 (TING RAYMOND M L [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 32; figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE8108886U (MICKELEIT) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]FI841459 (HOESCH WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]WO0177457 ; | [Y]US5293728 ; | [Y]US5448865 ; | [Y]US5247770 ; | [Y]FI77294B ; | [Y]JPH08284373 ; | [Y]JP2000017816 ; | [Y]US4122641 ; | [Y]DE8108886U ; | [Y]AT364501B |