EP2076438 - BYPASS TURBOJET ENGINE NACELLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aircelle 8 Route du Pont 76700 Gonfreville L'Orcher / FR | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUCHEL, Guy, Bernard 316, rue Pierre Mendès F-76610 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
COLLIER, Jérôme 16, rue Franklin F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 03 /
DHAINAULT, Patrice 28, rue des Fermes F-76310 Ste Adresse / FR | 04 /
CONTE, François 6, rue de Villandry F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | 05 /
HILLEREAU, Nicolas 22, rue Louis Eudier F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 06 /
CHOUARD, Pierre-Alain 3, Square de Clignancourt F-75018 Paris / FR | 07 /
LEFORT, Guillaume 37, rue Proudhon F-75012 Paris / FR | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Jouanneau, Lionel, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 31-33 rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Jouanneau, Lionel, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 8 avenue du Président Wilson 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07858402.6 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007FR01633 | Priority number, date | FR20060008892 | 11.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0608892 | FR20070001899 | 16.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0701899 | [2009/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008043903 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076438 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/18 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
B64D27/18 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (EP,US);
B64D27/402 (EP,US);
B64D27/404 (EP,US);
B64D29/08 (EP,US);
B64D33/04 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F02K1/72 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | BYPASSGASTURBINENGONDEL | [2009/28] | English: | BYPASS TURBOJET ENGINE NACELLE | [2009/28] | French: | NACELLE POUR TURBORÉACTEUR DOUBLE FLUX | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 20.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9302920 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 17-19,24-28 * abstract * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 2; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US5277382 (SEELEN LAURENCE [US], et al) [A] 1,16,25* abstract *; | [X]GB2275308 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,16,27,28 * page 5, line 20 - line 36; figure 1 * * page 6, line 12 - line 15 * * page 8, line 22 - line 25; figure 7 *; | [A]US5524847 (BRODELL ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0733545 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-15,27,28 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0787895 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0884469 (HISPANO SUIZA SA [FR]) [DY] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0913569 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,16,18,19,22,23 * abstract *; | [XY]US2004245383 (UDALL KENNETH F [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-15,27,28 * paragraphs [0038] , [0052] , [0056]; figure 8 * [Y] 7; | [X]FR2873988 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [X] 1,16,17,20,22-28 * page 11, line 26 - line 28 * * page 22, line 2 - line 6; figures 1,7 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 9; figure 1 *; | [PX]FR2885877 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [PX] 1,16,17,24,28 * page 11, line 29 - line 31 * * page 22, line 20 - line 25; figures 1,3 * * page 13, line 3 - page 15, line 3 * | by applicant | EP0884469 | FR2903076 | FR20060008892 |