EP2089473 - METHACRYLIC COMPOSITION FOR OBTAINING A COATING HAVING A ROUGH TEXTURE AND A MATT APPEARANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELPRAT, Patrick 16, chemin du Cam Loung 64230 Lescar / FR | 02 /
BERGE, Jérôme 14, rue de Dieu 64360 Monein / FR | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07858677.3 | 08.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007FR52316 | Priority number, date | FR20060054854 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0654854 | [2009/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059157 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089473 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089473 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/12 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C09D133/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31794 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | METHACRYLISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG EINER BESCHICHTUNG MIT RAUER TEXTUR UND MATTER ERSCHEINUNG | [2009/34] | English: | METHACRYLIC COMPOSITION FOR OBTAINING A COATING HAVING A ROUGH TEXTURE AND A MATT APPEARANCE | [2009/34] | French: | COMPOSITION METHACRYLIQUE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UN REVETEMENT AU TOUCHER RUGUEUX ET D'ASPECT MAT | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 27.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2011
Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2011
Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Brehm, Manfred Evonik Röhm GmbH DG-IPM-PAT Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 18.08.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.04.2012 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/12] | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | LI | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | LU | 08.11.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | HU | 07.04.2011 | [2016/22] |
Former [2013/14] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LU | 08.11.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
HU | 07.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03037983 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1541339 (ARKEMA [FR]) [A] 1-18* the whole document * |