EP2091910 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF (3 S) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-OXOPENTA NOIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/35] | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF ( 3 S ) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-0X0PENTA NOIC ACID | ||
[2014/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conatus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 16745 W. Bernardo Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2014/51] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Conatus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 4365 Executive Drive Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Idun Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 9380 Judicial Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMOCK, Stuart 24144 Grayston Drive Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 02 /
HAGEN, Eric 1123 Trillium Lane Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US | 03 /
HANKO, Jason 4301 Antiquity Court West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Savic, Bojan, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2010/43] | Ritter, Thomas Kurt, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Motion, Keith Robert Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07859033.8 | 03.12.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007IB03900 | Priority number, date | US20060868748P | 06.12.2006 Original published format: US 868748 P | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008068615 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091910 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091910 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/22, A61K31/197, A61P1/16 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
C07C237/22 (EP,NO,US);
C07C235/74 (KR);
A61K31/167 (KR);
A61K31/197 (NO);
A61P1/16 (EP);
C07C235/52 (KR);
C07B2200/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON (3 S) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-OXO-PENTANSÄURE | [2014/18] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF (3 S) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-OXOPENTA NOIC ACID | [2014/18] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES DE L'ACIDE (3 S) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5-(2 ',3 ',5 ',6 ' -TETRAFLUOROPHENOXY) -4-OXOPENTANOIQUE | [2014/18] |
Former [2009/35] | KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON ( 3 S ) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-0X0-PENTANSÄURE | ||
Former [2009/35] | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF ( 3 S ) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYLPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5- (2 ', 3 ', 5 ', 6 ' -TETRAFLUORO PHENOXY) -4-0X0PENTA NOIC ACID | ||
Former [2009/35] | FORMES CRISTALLINES DE L'ACIDE ( 3 S ) -3- [N- (N' - (2-TERT-BUTYPHENYL) OXAMYL) ALANINYL] AMINO-5-(2 ',3 ',5 ',6 ' -TETRAFLUOROPHENOXY) -4-OXOPENTANOIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/31] | CY | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | EE | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | EE | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | EE | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002042376 (KARANEWSKY DONALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 126 *; | [A] - STEVEN D. LINTON ET AL, "First-in-Class Pan Caspase Inhibitor Developed for the Treatment of Liver Disease", J. MED. CHEM., (20050610), vol. 48, no. 22, pages 6779 - 6782, XP002474577 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm050307e | [A] - STEVEN D. LINTON ET AL, "First-in-Class Pan Caspase Inhibitor Developed for the Treatment of Liver Disease", J. MED. CHEM., (20050610), vol. 48, no. 22, pages 1 - 23, XP002474578 [A] 1-15 * Supporting information pages 22 and 23. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0400101 |