EP2094734 - POLYSACCHARIDES DERIVATISED WITH CITRIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigea S.R.L. Area Science Park Padriciano 99 34012 Trieste / IT | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCO, Marco Gradisca d'Isonzo Via Don Minzoni, 1/A 34072 Gorizia / IT | 02 /
STUCCHI, Luca Pavia di Udine, Fr. Risano Via della Stazione, 16/B 33050 Udine / IT | 03 /
PICOTTI, Fabrizio Buttrio Via Pavia, 103 33042 Udine / IT | 04 /
GIANNI, Rita Monrupino Località Repen 105 34016 Trieste / IT | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07859099.9 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007IB03980 | Priority number, date | EP20060425873 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06425873 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008081257 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2094734 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094734 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2094734 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08B3/12, C08B31/04 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
C08B31/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08B3/12 (EP,US);
C08B33/02 (EP,US);
C08B37/0018 (EP,US);
C08B37/003 (EP,US);
C08B37/0036 (EP,US);
C08B37/0063 (EP,US);
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | MIT CITRONENSÄURE DERIVATISIERTE POLYSACCHARIDE | [2009/36] | English: | POLYSACCHARIDES DERIVATISED WITH CITRIC ACID | [2009/36] | French: | POLYSACCHARIDES DÉRIVÉS AVEC DE L'ACIDE CITRIQUE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 18.12.2010 | IE | 18.12.2010 | LT | 18.12.2010 | LU | 18.12.2010 | SK | 18.12.2010 | HU | 19.12.2010 | SE | 19.12.2010 | SI | 19.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | DK | 03.01.2011 | IS | 15.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
DK | 03.01.2011 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
IT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LU | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
DK | 03.01.2011 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
IT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
DK | 03.01.2011 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
IT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
DK | 03.01.2011 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
IT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
IT | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
SI | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SK | 18.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
IE | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
SE | 19.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2010 | ||
LT | 18.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/28] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2759787 (TOUEY GEORGE P, et al) [DA] 1-15 * examples 1-5 *; | [X]US3097051 (WADE RICARDO H) [X] 1-15 * col. 2 formula (II); column 3, line 37 - line 55; example 4 *; | [A]EP1702606 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE])[A] 14,15; | [DA] - GAFFAR M A, "PREPARATION AND UTILIZATION OF NEW CARBOXYL GROUP CONTAINING CATION EXCHANGERS BASED ON STARCH USING A DRY REACTION METHOD", STARKE - STARCH, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (200205), vol. 54, no. 5, ISSN 0038-9056, pages 185 - 192, XP001102117 [DA] 1-15 * page 185 - page 186 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-379X(200205)54:5<185::AID-STAR185>3.0.CO;2-F | by applicant | US3097051 | EP1702606 | - CARB. POL, (2003), vol. 51, pages 265 - 271 | - J. APPI. POLYM. SCI, (2004), vol. 94, pages 1999 - 2007 |