EP2120705 - WIRELESS INTERVENTIONAL DEVICE AND A SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS ENERGY TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/48] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIRTZ, Daniel High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LIPS, Oliver High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KRUEGER, Sascha High Tech Campus Building 44 5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
DAVID, Bernd High Tech Campus Building 44 5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
WEISS, Steffen High Tech Campus Building 44 5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07859389.4 | 17.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007IB55143 | Priority number, date | EP20060126778 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06126778 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008078251 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120705 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/07 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61B5/07 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
G01R33/287 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE INTERVENTIONELLE VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR DRAHTLOSE ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2009/48] | English: | WIRELESS INTERVENTIONAL DEVICE AND A SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS ENERGY TRANSMISSION | [2009/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERVENTION SANS FIL ET SYSTÈME POUR UNE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4187854 (CITRON PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 2 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 9 *; | [Y]US5833603 (KOVACS GREGORY T A [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,6-9 * column 6, line 38 - line 56 * * column 7, line 7 - line 16 * * column 15, line 50 - line 65 * * column 18, line 15 - line 24 *; | [X]US6015387 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * column 3, line 8 - line 65 * * column 4, line 52 - line 54 *; | [A]US6236205 (LUEDEKE KAI-MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 4,5,7 * column 4, line 5 - line 64 * * column 7, line 24 - line 30 ** column 7, line 59 - line 64 *; | [X]US6464687 (ISHIKAWA AKIRA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * column 12, line 52 - line 67 * * column 13, line 33 - column 14, line 40 * * column 17, line 59 - column 18, line 9 * * column 19, line 25 - line 43 * * column 23, line 23 - line 34 *; | [Y]WO2005115542 (UNIV COLLEGE CORK NAT UNIV IE [IE], et al) [Y] 1,3,6-9 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 5 *; | [X]US2006206170 (DENKER STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * | Examination | US2004039423 | by applicant | US4187854 | US6015387 | US6464687 | US6474341 |