EP2103159 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVAL SIGNAL WITH STAGGERED REFERENCE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOWALSKI, John M. c/o SHARP Laboratories of America Inc. 5750 Nortwest Pacific Rim Boulevard Camas, Washington 98607 / US | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07860539.1 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007JP75342 | Priority number, date | US20060616651 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: US 616651 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008078830 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103159 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H04J11/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04J11/00 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN EINES ÜBERTRAGUNGSZEITINTERVALLSIGNALS MIT GESTAFFELTEN REFERENZSIGNALEN | [2009/39] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING A TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVAL SIGNAL WITH STAGGERED REFERENCE SIGNALS | [2009/39] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRANSMETTRE UN SIGNAL D'INTERVALLE TEMPOREL DE TRANSMISSION AVEC DES SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DÉCALÉS | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006013610 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO2006118124 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008502225 |