EP2108176 - TRAVEL INFORMATION SERVICE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TRAVEL INFORMATION OF THE SAME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thinkware Systems Corporation Hanmi Tower 15 Fl., 45 Bangi-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-050 / KR | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WON, Joonghie No. 105-801 Sungwon 1-cha Apt. Singok 1-dong Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do 480-727 / KR | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/42] | Carangelo, Pierluigi Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via della Quattro Fontane 15 00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 07860676.1 | 27.12.2007 | [2009/42] | WO2007KR06857 | Priority number, date | KR20070010972 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070010972 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093935 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108176 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06Q10/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01C21/343 (EP,US);
G06Q50/14 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/3679 (US);
G01C21/3611 (US);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | REISEINFORMATIONSDIENSTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON REISEINFORMATIONEN FÜR DAS GLEICHE SYSTEM | [2009/42] | English: | TRAVEL INFORMATION SERVICE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TRAVEL INFORMATION OF THE SAME SYSTEM | [2009/42] | French: | SYSTÈME E DE SERVICES D'INFORMATIONS SUR LES VOYAGES ET MÉTHODE FOURNISSANT DES INFORMATIONS SUR LES VOYAGES DANS CE MÊME SYSTÈME | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.02.2016 | 05.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 31.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods (OJ 11/2007; p592f) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [Y]KR20060114943 (THINKWARE SYSTEMS CORP [KR]); | [Y]KR20060095601 (MANDO MAP & SOFT CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2004144506 (MAZDA MOTOR) | Examination | EP1054236 |