EP2091895 - METHOD FOR REDUCING AND/OR PREVENTING PRODUCTION OF EXCESSIVELY LOW DENSITY POLYMER PRODUCT DURING POLYMERIZATION TRANSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe, Suite 1950 Houston TX 77056-2746 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVATSKY, Bruce J. 2303 Pine Blossom Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 02 /
ZILKER, Daniel P. Jr. 1336 Johnson Road Charleston, WV 25314 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07862959.9 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US25678 | Priority number, date | US20060875444P | 18.12.2006 Original published format: US 875444 P | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008076386 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091895 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091895 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F2/34 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F2400/02 (EP,US);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US);
Y10S526/905 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/08 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | C07C2/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERMINDERN UND/ODER VERHINDERN DER BILDUNG VON POLYMERPRODUKT MIT ÜBERMÄSSIG NIEDRIGER DICHTE WÄHREND POLYMERISIERUNGSÜBERGÄNGEN | [2009/35] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING AND/OR PREVENTING PRODUCTION OF EXCESSIVELY LOW DENSITY POLYMER PRODUCT DURING POLYMERIZATION TRANSITIONS | [2009/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ VISANT À RÉDUIRE ET/OU À EMPÊCHER LA FABRICATION DE PRODUIT POLYMÈRE DE DENSITÉ EXCESSIVEMENT FAIBLE DURANT LES TRANSITIONS DE POLYMÉRISATION | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 22.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2007 | AT | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | IE | 12.12.2012 | LU | 12.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
LU | 12.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005049663 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0116]; claims 21,24,28 *; | [X]US2005267267 (SANDELL DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * claim 26 *; | [X]WO0032651 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 15, line 3 - page 16, line 6 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO03044061 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [AD]US6649710 (MORTEROL FREDERIC ROBERT MARIE [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * column 3, line 24 - line 36; claim - *; | [XP]US2007073010 (PANNELL RICHARD B [US], et al) [XP] 1 * claim 1 *; | [EL]WO2008030313 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0055] , [0056]; claims 31,32 * [L] | International search | [X]US2005267267 (SANDELL DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US2005085598 (SANDELL DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US2006281878 (KOLB RAINER [US], et al) |