EP2134713 - NOVEL JNK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDY, Panduranga, Adulla, P. 32 Bubbling Brook Road Walpole, MA 02081 / US | 02 /
SIDDIQUI, Arshad, M. 10 Ohio Avenue Newton, MA 02464 / US | 03 /
TADIKONDA, Praveen, K. 21 Arcadia Road Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 04 /
MANSOOR, Umar, Faruk 1025 Waverly Street, Unit A Framingham, MA 01702 / US | 05 /
SHIPPS, Gerald, W., Jr. 5 Daniel Drive Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | 06 /
BELANGER, David, B. 27 Chalk Street, 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
ZHAO, Lianyun 3 Radcliff Street Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07863020.9 | 17.12.2007 | [2009/52] | WO2007US25780 | Priority number, date | US20060875989P | 20.12.2006 Original published format: US 875989 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008082490 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2134713 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/437, A61P29/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | 28.03.2008 | BA | 28.03.2008 | HR | 28.03.2008 | MK | 28.03.2008 | RS | 28.03.2008 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE JNK-HEMMER | [2009/52] | English: | NOVEL JNK INHIBITORS | [2009/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE JNK | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 10.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005085252 (BIOFOCUS DISCOVERY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 6-17,41-51 * page 3, line 11 - page 8, line 7 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 32 *; | [A]WO2006125101 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 6-17,41-51 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] *; | [A]EP1380576 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 6-17,41-51 * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]WO2004013138 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * Intermediate 21 *; | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:606563, XP002486349 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1965), pages 2778 - 2786 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:4453405, XP002486350 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - SYNTHESIS, (1984), vol. 3, pages 263 - 265 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:515555, XP002486351 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 15, page 119 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:8067187, XP002486352 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1998), vol. 37, no. 16, pages 2234 - 2237 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:10160724, XP002486353 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, no. 48, pages 8355 - 8357 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:980922, XP002486354 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - JOURNAL FUER PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, (1971), vol. 313, pages 977 - 985 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. BRN:976835, XP002486355 [X] 1 * column A * | [ ] - GETEROTSIKLICHESKIKH SOEDINENII, (1967), vol. 1, page 166 |