EP2223513 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASSOCIATING IMAGES WITH DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/35] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEARS, Mark Gilmore 6514 Hyde Park Drive Zionsville Indiana 46077 / US | 02 /
MODI, Khelan 10834 Pleasant View Lane Fishers Indiana 46038 / US | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies 12 place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Novagraaf Technologies 12 Place des Halles Saint Louis 56100 Lorient / FR | ||
Former [2010/35] | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 07863117.3 | 19.12.2007 | [2010/35] | WO2007US25954 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009078843 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223513 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2223513 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/2745, H04M1/57 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/576 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04M1/27475 (EP,KR,US);
H04M2201/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ASSOZIIEREN VON BILDERN MIT DATEN | [2010/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASSOCIATING IMAGES WITH DATA | [2010/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ASSOCIER DES IMAGES À DES DONNÉES | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 03.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2007 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IE | 19.12.2017 | LU | 19.12.2017 | MT | 19.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 19.12.2007 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.12.2007 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.12.2007 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 19.12.2017 | ||
MT | 19.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1067748 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,16,22 * paragraphs [0040] , [0052] - [0059] *; | [X]US2005232247 (WHITLEY NOEL [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0030] , [0059] , [0074] , [0079] - [0083]; figures 3a,5,7b *; | [X]US2006061810 (CHOI A-RAM [KR], et al) [X] 1,16,22 * paragraphs [0035] , [0041] *; | [A]US7046994 (PADAWER ANDREW D [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 4, line 37 - line 48; figure 4 ** column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 50 *; | [A]US2007206733 (BENNETT JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0062] - [0069] *; | [A]US2007237312 (GUITARTE PEREZ JESUS F [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0013] , [0021] - [0033] * | Examination | US2002094806 |