EP1991460 - METHOD AND BRAKE ASSEMBLY RETENTION DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Lei Honeywell International Inc. / Patent Services M\S - AB\2B P.O.Box 22445 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
BEEHLER, Jon 68270 Riley Trail Bremen, Indiana 46506 / US | 03 /
ZAREMBKA, Michael J. 52240 Filbert Road Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
TONG, Lei Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M\S - AB\2B P.O.Box 22445 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
02 /
BEEHLER, Jon 68270 Riley Trail Bremen, Indiana 46506 / US | |||
03 /
ZAREMBKA, Michael J. 52240 Filbert Road Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | |||
Former [2008/47] | 01 /
TONG, Lei 3250 Chalk Maple Court Couth Bend, Indiana 46628 / US | ||
02 /
BEEHLER, Jon 68270 Riley Trail Bremen, Indiana 46506 / US | |||
03 /
ZAREMBKA, Michael J. 52240 Filbert Road Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/47] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07863324.5 | 05.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007US63270 | Priority number, date | US20060368807 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: US 368807 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008048701 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1991460 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991460 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00, F16D55/00, B64C25/42 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
B64C25/42 (EP,US);
F16D65/0043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | B64C25/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/24] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BREMSANORDNUNGSRÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG MIT AUTOMATISCHEM BETRIEB | [2008/47] | English: | METHOD AND BRAKE ASSEMBLY RETENTION DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC OPERATION | [2008/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE D'ENSEMBLE FREIN À FONCTIONNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 07.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1334453 (SIGMA) [A] 1,11 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 3-5 *; | [A]GB1345174 (BUSCH W, et al) [A] 1,11 * page 2, lines 42-83; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0035327 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 8 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2100375 (LUCAS IND PLC) [X] 1-5,8,9,11-15,17,18 * page 1, lines 71-88 * * page 1, lines 107-112 * * page 2, lines 10-13 * * page 2, lines 48-97 * * page 2, lines 118-129 * * page 3, lines 13-21; figure 4 *; | [A]US5402865 (HARKER BRIAN G [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 36-46 ** column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 20; figures 2-5 * | by applicant | GB2100375 |