EP2079583 - BIODEGRADABLE BLISTER PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Corporation 501 South 5th Street Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Corporation 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWES, David H 9113 Islamorada Lane Raleigh, North Carolina 27603 / US | 02 /
WADE, Michael P 4808 Stoney Oak Lane Raleigh, North Carolina 27610 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby CV21 2LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07863536.4 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US82611 | Priority number, date | US20060857035P | 06.11.2006 Original published format: US 857035 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008057797 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2079583 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B65D73/0092 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE BLISTER-PACKUNG | [2009/30] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE BLISTER PACK | [2009/30] | French: | EMBALLAGE ALVÉOLAIRE THERMOFORMEE BIODÉGRADABLE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/45] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2010 | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9965977 (BIOTEC BIOLOG NATURVERPACK [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,4,23 * * page 4, line 17 *; | [X]WO02072335 (TRESPAPHAN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1* claims 1,17,29,30 *; | [X]WO02087851 (TRESPAPHAN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,19,27,28 * |