EP2092721 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHANGING TO A SPEAKERPHONE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEW, Kee Joo Blk 356, Clementi Ave 2, 19-283 Singapore 120356 / SG | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07864054.7 | 07.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US83975 | Priority number, date | US20060610971 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: US 610971 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008076540 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092721 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092721 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN AUF EINEN LAUTSPRECHERMODUS | [2009/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHANGING TO A SPEAKERPHONE MODE | [2009/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PASSER EN MODE ÉCOUTE AMPLIFIÉE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2007 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 07.11.2017 | LU | 07.11.2017 | MT | 07.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | FR | 18.12.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 07.11.2007 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.11.2007 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.11.2007 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 07.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
MT | 07.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 07.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2359947 (SAGEM [FR]) [Y] 15 * page 1, line 3 - line 11 * * page 2, line 10 - line 12 * * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * * page 6, line 8 - line 18 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,2,6,10-12,14; | [Y]US2003008689 (UDA YOSHIHIDE [JP]) [Y] 3,7-9,13 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 4-6 *; | [IY]US6547620 (HATAMURA JUNJI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,10-12,14 * column 5, line 18 - line 45 * * column 8, line 23 - line 37 * * column 9, line 17 - line 24 * * column 10, line 4 - line 11 * * column 10, line 25 - line 44 * * column 13, line 16 - line 23 * * column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 27 * * column 15, line 4 - line 24 * * figures 4-6 * [Y] 3,7-9,13,15; | [A]US2006073819 (LOWLES ROBERT J [CA]) [A] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] ** figure 1 *; | [XP]EP1838075 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5224151 (BOWEN DONALD J [US], et al); | [Y]US6230029 (HAHN STAN S [US], et al); | [Y]US7027804 (MUFTI MOYEEN SHUJAUDDIN [GB], et al) | by applicant | GB2359947 | US2003008689 | US6547620 | US2006073819 | EP1838075 |