EP2191382 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND/OR APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL SIGNAL SORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Open Interface North America, INC. 520 Pike Street, Suite 1770 Seattle, Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Gregory 1240 3rd Avenue N. Seattle, Washington 98109 / US | 02 /
RUTSCHMAN, Phillip 3958 S. Lucile St. Seattle, Washington 98118 / US | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07864170.1 | 08.11.2007 | [2010/22] | WO2007US84188 | Priority number, date | US20070840887 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 840887 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009025677 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191382 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191382 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/30, G06F15/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H03M7/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND/ODER VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIGITALSIGNALSORTIERUNG | [2010/22] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND/OR APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL SIGNAL SORTING | [2010/22] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ, ET/OU APPAREIL POUR UN TRI DE SIGNAL NUMÉRIQUE | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2007 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 08.11.2018 | LU | 08.11.2018 | MT | 08.11.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.11.2007 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
MT | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 22.08.2018 | |
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - PATTICHIS M S ET AL, "On the representation of wideband images using permutations for lossless coding", 20000402; 20000402 - 20000404, (20000402), pages 237 - 241, XP010378666 [X] 1,2,16,17 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,10-13 [I] 8,9,15,18 | [Y] - ESTIVILL-CASTRO V ET AL, "Classical sorting embedded in genetic algorithms for improved permutation search", EVOLUTIONARY COMPUTATION, 2001. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 CONGRESS ON MAY 27-30, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010527), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-6657-2, pages 941 - 948, XP010551901 [Y] 3 * page 941, column r, paragraph l * * page 942, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 943, column l, line 21 - line 28 * * figure 3 * | [Y] - COVER T M, "ENUMERATIVE SOURCE ENCODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE PRESS, USA, (19730101), vol. IT-19, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TIT.1973.1054929, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 73 - 77, XP001031014 [Y] 3-5,10-13 * page 75, column l, line 3 - line 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1973.1054929 | [A] - BABAEV A A, "Procedures of encoding and decoding of permutations", CYBERNETICS USA, (198411), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0011-4235, pages 861 - 863, XP002655258 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - Stefan Pesko, "Differential evolution for small TSPs with constraints", 4th International Scientific Conference "Challenges in Transport and Communication", (20060915), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://frcatel.fri.uniza.sk/users/pesko/publ/DeTSP.pdf, (20110801), XP002655262 [A] 3 * page 3, line 8 - line l * | International search | [A]US2003048499 (ALFANO ROBERT R [US], et al)[A] 1-62; | [A]US6885991 (SKONBERG CARL M [US], et al) [A] 1-62; | [A]US2005135788 (FUJII HIROMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-62; | [X]US7007166 (MOSKOWITZ SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 1-62 * , abstract, entire document, especially col 2, In 5-9, In 40-43, In 59-61, col 3, In 12, In 61, col 4, In 10-19, col 6, In 33-47, col 7, In 25-30, In 43-48, In 60-65, col 8, In 1-5, In 57-59, col 9, In 6-8, In 12-16, In 27-38, In 47-54, col 10, In 1-21, In 42-44, In 65, col 11, In 28, In 35, In 58-6 * | Examination | - Ziya Arnavut, "Application of inversions to lossless image compression", Proceedings Optical Diagnostics of Living Cells II, US, (19961114), vol. 2847, doi:10.1117/12.258259, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-1324-9, pages 491 - 499, XP055445568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.258259 |