EP2125089 - LONG NOSE MANIPULATABLE CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micrus Endovascular Corporation 821 Fox Lane San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVINE, Marc-Alan 1294 St. Peters Road Pottstown, Pennsylvania 19465 / US | 02 /
HEBERT, Stephen 2250 Bay Street, 212 San Francisco, California 94123 / US | 03 /
BRETON, Thomas G. 576 North Henry Avenue San Jose, California 95117 / US | 04 /
WATSON, David A. 2191 Nola Drive San Jose, California 95125 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07864826.8 | 27.11.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007US85620 | Priority number, date | US20060641490 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: US 641490 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008079575 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125089 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/09 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61M25/008 (EP,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M2025/015 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1079 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | MANIPULIERBARER LONGNASEN-KATHETER | [2009/49] | English: | LONG NOSE MANIPULATABLE CATHETER | [2009/49] | French: | CATHÉTER MANIPULABLE À LONG BEC | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2011 | 30.11.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001039412 (FARIABI SEPEHR [US]) [A] 28-42 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] *; | [Y]US6544215 (BENCINI BOB [US], et al) [Y] 29-34 * figure 8 ** columns 2,6 *; | [Y]EP1389478 (CRYOCOR INC [US]) [Y] 29-34 * abstract * * figures 6-8 * * paragraph [0022] *; | [XY]US2005075661 (LEVINE MARC-ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-28,35-42 * the whole document * [Y] 29-34; | [A]EP1685870 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 28-42 * figure 2 * * abstract * * columns 1,2 * |