EP2100271 - POST-RENDER GRAPHICS TRANSPARENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEYBREW, Steven Todd 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Simon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ELLIS, Brian 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07865728.5 | 15.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007US87693 | Priority number, date | US20060870361P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 870361 P | US20070955239 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: US 955239 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008076951 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2100271 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
G06T15/503 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (KR);
G06T15/005 (EP,US);
G06T15/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | GRAFIKTRANSPARENZ NACH DARSTELLUNG | [2009/38] | English: | POST-RENDER GRAPHICS TRANSPARENCY | [2009/38] | French: | TRANSPARENCE GRAPHIQUE APRÈS RENDU | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5923333 (STROYAN HOWARD D [US]) [X] 1,7,13,19 * abstract * * column 4, line 21 - line 58; figure 1 * * column 2, line 21 - line 32 *; | [A]US2004021659 (PEERCY MARK [US], et al); | [A] - KAY D S ET AL, "TRANSPARENCY FOR COMPUTER SYNTHESIZED IMAGES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, ACM, US, (19790101), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0097-8930, pages 158 - 164, XP001017856 [A] 1-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/965103.807438 | [A] - SMITH A. R., "Alpha and the History of Digital Compositing", MICROSOFT TECHNICAL MEMO, (1995), no. 7, XP002489918 | [A] - ZHANG Y., PAJAROLA R., "Single-Pass Point Rendering and Transparency Shading", EUROGRAPHICS SYMPOSIUM ON POINT-BASED GRAPHICS, (20060904), XP002489919 | [A] - AILA T. ET AL., "Delay Streams for Graphics Hardware", ACM, (2003), XP002489920 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/882262.882347 | Examination | - MOELLER R., "State-of-the-art 3D Graphics for Embedded Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DEVICES, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, MEXICO, (20060426), doi:10.1109/ICCDCS.2006.250884, pages 339 - 343 |