EP2127124 - DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND A METHOD OF OPERATING DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS FOR GENERATING REPRESENTATIONS OF AVAILABILITY STATUS FOR APPLICATION PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77707 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Palm, Inc. 950 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'SHAUGHNESSY, Kevin Michael C/o Palm, Inc. 950 W. Maude Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US | 02 /
JAGER, Ivo Ruben Willem C/o Palm, Inc. 950 W. Maude Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Potter, Julian Mark W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07865816.8 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007US87961 | Priority number, date | US20060615792 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615792 | US20060615801 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615801 | US20060615805 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615805 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008079823 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2127124 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G06F9/54 (EP);
H04L67/54 (EP);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L67/568 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON REPRÄSENTATIONEN DES VERFÜGBARKEITSSTATUS FÜR ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMME | [2009/49] | English: | DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND A METHOD OF OPERATING DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS FOR GENERATING REPRESENTATIONS OF AVAILABILITY STATUS FOR APPLICATION PROGRAMS | [2009/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES PRODUISANT DES REPRÉSENTATIONS DE L'ÉTAT DE DISPONIBILITÉ DE PROGRAMMES D'APPLICATION | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004034718 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 5 * * page 9, lines 14-27 ** page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 20 * | International search | [A]US2002083127 (AGRAWAL ANURAAG [US]) [A] 1-24; | [X]US2005210113 (KASUGA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-24 * para. [0003]-[0007], [0021]-[0031], [0034]-[0045], [0058]-[0074], [0079]. *; | [A]US2006195532 (ZLATEFF CARMEN [US], et al)[A] 1-24 |