EP2117544 - BIOMARKER IDENTIFYING THE REACTIVATION OF STAT3 AFTER SRC INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | |||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, VT 08543 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Faye M. 235 Angel Leaf Road The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | 02 /
DONATO, Nicholas J. 815 Sandpiper Drive Sugarland, TX 77478 / US | 03 /
LEE, Francis Y. 363 Lang Court Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07865826.7 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007US87982 | Priority number, date | US20060870737P | 19.12.2006 Original published format: US 870737 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008077064 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2117544 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/277, C07D213/57, C07C255/41 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | 20.07.2009 | BA | 20.07.2009 | HR | 20.07.2009 | MK | 20.07.2009 | RS | 20.07.2009 | Title | German: | BIOMARKER ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG DER REAKTIVIERUNG VON STAT3 NACH SRC-HEMMUNG | [2009/47] | English: | BIOMARKER IDENTIFYING THE REACTIVATION OF STAT3 AFTER SRC INHIBITION | [2009/47] | French: | BIOMARQUEUR PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER LA REACTIVATION DE LA STAT3 APRES INHIBITION DE SRC | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.07.2012 | 19.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/06] | 27.09.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - JOHNSON FAYE M ET AL, "Dasatinib (BMS-354825) tyrosine kinase inhibitor suppresses invasion and induces cell cycle arrest and apoptosis of head and neck squamous cell carcinoma and non-small cell lung cancer cells.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 1 OCT 2005, (20051001), vol. 11, no. 19 Pt 1, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6924 - 6932, XP002558632 [X] 3 * materials and methods; p.6928 col.2, p.6931 col.2; figure 8 * [I] 1-2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-05-0757 | [A] - HAURA ERIC B, "SRC and STAT pathways.", JOURNAL OF THORACIC ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF LUNG CANCER JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 1556-1380, pages 403 - 405, XP009126668 [A] 1-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01243894-200606000-00003 | International search | [P] - JOHNSON F.M. ET AL., "Abrogation of signal transducer and activator of transcription 3 reactivation after src kinase inhibition results in synergistic antitumor effects", CLIN. CANCER RES., (20070715), vol. 13, no. 14, pages 4233 - 4244, XP008112271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-06-2981 | Examination | - QUINTAS-CARDAMA A ET AL, "Targeting ABL and SRC kinases in chronic myeloid leukemia: experience with dasatinib", FUTURE ONCOLOGY, FUTURE MEDICINE LTD., LONDON, GB, (20061201), vol. 2, doi:10.2217/14796694.2.6.655, ISSN 1479-6694, pages 655 - 665, XP009086262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/14796694.2.6.655 | - L. Pedranzini ET AL, "Pyridone 6, A Pan-Janus-Activated Kinase Inhibitor, Induces Growth Inhibition of Multiple Myeloma Cells", Cancer research, (20061001), vol. 66, no. 19, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-4280, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 9714 - 9721, XP055012563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-4280 | - DUHE R J ET AL, "NEGATIVE REGULATION OF JANUS KINASES", CELL BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, TOTOWA, NJ, US, (20010101), vol. 34, no. 1, doi:10.1385/CBB:34:1:17, ISSN 1085-9195, pages 17 - 59, XP008052128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/CBB:34:1:17 | - JING NAIJIE ET AL, "Targeting Stat3 in cancer therapy", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US; NL, (20050701), vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 601 - 607, XP009154227 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-200507000-00002 |