EP2103113 - RECORDING MEDIA ON GAMING CONSOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSHAK, Todd Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Jason Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
TURKSTRA, Chris Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SEETHARAMAN, Logananth Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
DISCOLO, Anthony Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
LAW, Stacey Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
MILLIGAN, Timothy S. Microsoft Corporation International Patents_nts One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Maximilianstrasse 13 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07866037.0 | 26.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007US88860 | Priority number, date | US20070620625 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 620625 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008085734 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103113 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/76, H04N5/91 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/44 (KR);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
H04N21/4781 (EP,US);
H04N5/91 (KR);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIEN AUF SPIELKONSOLEN | [2009/39] | English: | RECORDING MEDIA ON GAMING CONSOLES | [2009/39] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT MULTIMÉDIA SUR CONSOLE DE JEUX | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 13.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/29] | 26.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002083454 (BRAXTON MARK D [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2004073948 (ISHIBASHI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0088] * | [I] - Cawood, S., "Xbox 360 DVR ?", (20060831), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://geeklit.blogspot.com/2006/08/xbox-360-dvr.htmlbest, (20111028), XP007919656 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20010000558 (DO SUN MI [KR], et al); | [A]US2002142845 (RANDALL WHITTEN JON MARCUS [US], et al); | [A]US6929549 (YAMADA AKIHIRO [JP]) | by applicant | US2002083454 | US2004073948 |