EP2114909 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DERIVATIVES OF 3-AMINO-TETRAHYDROFURAN-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Zhengxu c/o Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | 02 /
GERLACH, Kai Ayestrasse 37 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 03 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Dhileepkumar c/o Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | 04 /
MATTHES, Burkhard Rathausstrasse 9 88410 Bad Wurzach / DE | 05 /
NAR, Herbert Hexenweg 19 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | 06 /
PRIEPKE, Henning Pfluggasse 15 88400 Biberach / DE | 07 /
SCHULER-METZ, Annette Birkenharderstr. 11 88447 Warthausen / DE | 08 /
SENANAYAKE, Chris H. Holzgasse 7 89081 Ulm / DE | 09 /
SIEGER, Peter c/o Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | 10 /
TANG, Wenjun Klingenaecker 7 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 11 /
WIENEN, Wolfgang c/o Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | 12 /
XU, Yibo Kirschenweg 27 88400 Biberach / DE | 13 /
YEE, Nathan K. c/o Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877-0368 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2009/48] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07866298.8 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007EP64406 | Priority number, date | US20060882937P | 31.12.2006 Original published format: US 882937 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008080891 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114909 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/24, C07D409/14, C07D413/14 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D307/24 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Extension states | BA | 31.07.2009 | HR | 31.07.2009 | RS | 31.07.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON DERIVATEN VON 3-AMINO-TETRAHYDROFURAN-3-CARBOXYLSÄURE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENTE | [2009/46] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DERIVATIVES OF 3-AMINO-TETRAHYDROFURAN-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS | [2009/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE DÉRIVÉS DE L'ACIDE 3-AMINO-TÉTRAHYDROFURAN-3-CARBOXYLIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI EN TANT QUE MÉDICAMENTS | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 11.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005111014 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-23,27-29 * page 138; claims 1-17; compounds 17, 18 *; | [A]WO2005111029 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-23,27-29 * page 178; examples 34,48; claims 1-15; compounds 21, 22 *; | [A]WO2006034822 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-23,27-29 * examples 2,13 *; | [AX] - LAVRADOR, KARINE ET AL, "A new series of cyclic amino acids as inhibitors of S-adenosyl L-methionine synthetase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS , 8(13), 1629-1634 CODEN: BMCLE8; ISSN: 0960-894X, (1998), XP002475921 [A] 1-23,27-29 * the whole document * * Scheme 2, compounds Ia-c, IIa-c * [X] 24-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00267-4 | Examination | - BHUSHAN RAVI ET AL, "Resolution of Enantiomers of Ibuprofen by Liquid Chromatography: A Review", BIOMEDICAL CHROMATOGRAPHY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (19981101), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0269-3879, pages 309 - 316, XP002668423 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-0801(199811/12)12:6<309::AID-BMC763>3.0.CO;2-K | - GÜBITZ G, "Separation of Drug Enantiomers by HPLC Using Chiral Stationary Phases A Selective Review", CHROMATOGRAPHIA, VIEWEG UND TEUBNER VERLAG, DE, (19901101), vol. 30, no. 9-10, ISSN 0009-5893, pages 555 - 564, XP002668422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02269804 | - ASHOK K PEEPLIWAL ET AL, "A Review: Stereochemical consideration and eudismic ratio in chiral drug development", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES AND RESEARCH, PHARMA INFO PUBLICATIONS, IN, (20100101), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 0975-542X, pages 29 - 45, XP007915083 | by applicant | WO2005111014 | WO2005111029 | WO2006034822 | - KARINE LAVRADOR, BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1998), vol. 8, no. 13, pages 1629 - 1634 |